Financial history THE BRAMPTON PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 511885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £66 £156 £107 £92 £16
Total expenditure £371 £440 £442 £452 £481
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A