HOMEWARD BOUND

Charity number: 1179111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 30 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 January 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download