CREWE AND NANTWICH GYMNASTICS AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES CENTRE

Charity number: 512109
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £354.45k £333.25k £312.35k £303.25k £216.88k
Total expenditure £350.06k £332.83k £323.43k £293.36k £264.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £53.80k