Trustees FAREHAM MEN'S SHED
Charity number: 1178126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS HODGSON | Chair | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Kinchen | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lane | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Zalenski | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Childs | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gary Rawlinson | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian McCarthy | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Arthur Jones | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Crane | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICK FOSTER | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MILTON AUGUSTINE HEWINS | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEORGE BUNCE | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROD PARKER | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN NIXON | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.