FACULTY OF MEDICAL LEADERSHIP AND MANAGEMENT

Charity number: 1178741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Kamila Hawthorne Trustee 18 October 2019
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF GENERAL PRACTITIONERS Received: On time
Dr PHILIP KLOER Trustee 18 June 2019 None on record
Professor WILLIAM ROBERT ROCHE Trustee 30 April 2011 None on record
STEPHEN ROGER DAVID BROOKS Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
DAVID ANTONY BENNETT Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
PROF BEE WEE Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Dr TAJ HASSAN Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
MARK ROBERT SPRAGG Trustee 01 November 2019
THE MARCELA TRUST Received: On time
Nargis Ara-Ranaldi Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Dr IAIN WALLACE Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
JENNY MARGARET ELIZABETH JANE EHRHARDT Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
PROF MAYUR LAKHANI CBE Trustee 16 December 2019 None on record
ALASTAIR HENDERSON Trustee 30 March 2019
HEALTHCARE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT PARTNERSHIP Received: On time