Accounts and annual returns BETHEL GOSPEL MINISTRIES LONDON

Charity number: 1178305
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window