Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DUNNINGTON

Charity number: 1178934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £142.18k £109.03k £99.21k £143.56k £147.84k
Total expenditure £130.17k £111.63k £108.53k £119.21k £118.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.93k £1.67k £498 £218 £400