Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DUNNINGTON
Charity number: 1178934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Poole | Chair | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Muir | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Beale | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Pomfret | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Rickell | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Wilson | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eldridge | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Hogg | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Skilbeck | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Woolley FCA | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Neale | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann White | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Marion Hewitt | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
MARY JUDITH MURRAY | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY JOAN VERRIER | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
EVA LILIAN EDITH SCOREBY | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRANK HELM | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.