Financial history 1ST THRINGSTONE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £9.27k £9.81k £8.32k £10.75k £1.76k
Total expenditure £8.91k £9.81k £8.30k £3.82k £4.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A