Accounts and annual returns THE GREGYNOG TRUST

Charity number: 1180943
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 May 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required