WILSHAW VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 512468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £4.64k £4.63k £6.76k £17.49k £18.99k
Total expenditure £2.65k £2.65k £9.61k £14.22k £4.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £17.34k