Accounts and annual returns SOUTHWOLD (SOLE BAY) LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1179884
Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 29 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window