MIGRATEFUL

Charity number: 1180110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mireille Cassandra Harper Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Amaya Jeyarajah Dent Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
Nora Bali Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
Sayed Habib Sadat Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
Daljeet Singh Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
MARY LAVINIA ANNE LOCKE Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record
Emily Miller Trustee 21 February 2019 None on record
ISABEL PASSOS SACHS Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record