Trustees CARERS' HUB
Charity number: 1182120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Perkins | Chair | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ijeoma Obi | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Clare Oka | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oritseweyinmi Guate | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Natalie Wall | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hebditch | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Ralph Hynard | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amit Ashok Desai | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDWIN STANLEY NORRIS | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.