LCPT

Charity number: 512719
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £1.13m £1.25m £871.46k £804.46k £614.34k
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.25m £1.05m £865.30k £644.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £470.89k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £116.30k £90.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £859 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £82.71k £95.86k £35.85k £8.05k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.15m £829.48k £782.22k £612.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £644 £469 £5.13k £2.35k £1.97k
Income - Other £0 £640 £1.01k £11.84k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.24m £993.83k £850.91k £644.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.47k £11.94k £6.99k £8.93k £4.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £50.00k £5.45k £0