Trustees THE WORLD COMMUNITY FOR CHRISTIAN MEDITATION
Charity number: 1182213
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATHIAS BEISSWENGER | Chair | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cresswell | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Angelene Chan Li Chen | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John C Siska | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Rankin Rathbone | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steffen Naumann | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Scott | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
BERTRAND BOUHOUR | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Father LAURENCE CHARLES FREEMAN OSB | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.