Accounts and annual returns PEACE AND DESIST
Charity number: 1183919
Charity reporting is overdue by 771 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 40 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 40 days | |
Annual return | 10 May 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 May 2021 | 17 April 2023 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 771 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 May 2020 | 05 July 2022 | 482 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2020 | 05 July 2022 | 482 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window