BIRCHWOOD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1179696
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 May 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 May 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 05 April 2020 On time Download