Accounts and annual returns AASHIANA

Charity number: 1184047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required