Trustees SUTTON BINGHAM SAILING CLUB

Charity number: 1183072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bryan Charles Martyn Trustee 07 January 2022
None on record
Michael Riley Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Nigel Martin Leveridge Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Christopher Jonathan Bottomley Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
David Saddington Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Joanne Mahy Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Philip Geoffrey Bailey Trustee 23 April 2019
MONTACUTE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Philip Alan Faulds Godfrey Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Mervyn Raymond Clark Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Susan Petts Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record