Trustees ESCAPE2MAKE
Charity number: 1183572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Kistler | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Cahalin | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kym Cardona | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bullock | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KAMAL ESSA | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
David Beuzeval | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Mary Samson | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Frances Shed McKay | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jonathan Charnley | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Natusch | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.