ST CUTHBERT'S CARE

Charity number: 512912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.41m £9.77m £10.09m £9.82m £9.80m
Total expenditure £9.52m £9.69m £9.69m £9.74m £9.67m
Income from government contracts £7.76m £9.40m £9.06m £7.75m £9.12m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £281.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £622.85k £257.27k £374.40k £275.26k £216.01k
Income - Other trading activities £494.14k £104.19k £648.49k £304.50k £177.27k
Income - Charitable activities £9.29m £9.40m £9.06m £9.23m £9.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.40k £2.46k £4.74k £7.57k £4.91k
Income - Other £0 £600 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £176.80k £25.23k £65.13k £35.47k £51.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.36m £9.64m £9.47m £9.63m £9.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £163.43k £47.62k £221.46k £112.65k £30.23k
Expenditure - Governance £20.60k £21.05k £22.19k £22.96k £31.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £6.00k £0 £0 £0 £0