Financial history LIVERPOOL 8 LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 513018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £36.56k £2.26k £49.02k £0
Total expenditure £21.31k £46.45k £24.38k £14.15k £4.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A