Cultura Trust

Charity number: 513055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download