Cultura Trust

Charity number: 513055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £484.88k £395.72k £1.17m £772.02k £409.33k
Total expenditure £483.90k £393.87k £1.17m £766.19k £389.64k
Income from government contracts £82.46k £59.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.88k £5.00k £35.08k £11.04k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £30.41k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.12m £695.55k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £42.17k £36.11k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £10.24k £9.95k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.17m £766.19k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.80k £3.85k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A