Accounts and annual returns SANCTUARY ON SEA (BRIGHTON & HOVE CITY OF SANCTUARY)

Charity number: 1183229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2022 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 March 2022 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late Download Open in new window