Trustees BRISTOL & SOMERSET RAYNET GROUP
Charity Number: 1182470

Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE WHITEHEAD | Chair | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bessant | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hildich | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ottaway | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ODAM | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RON HARDIE | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILL WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.