Accounts and annual returns LANDSKER TRUST
Charity number: 1184217
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2024 | 772 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2024 | 777 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 March 2024 | 1137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2024 | 1142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window