Dogfen lywodraethu DISABILITY SUPPORT GROUP (NORTH EAST)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 16 SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 25 MAY 1988 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 29 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JANUARY 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DISABLED IN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS WITHIN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND. 2 TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
CITY OF SUNDERLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.