HELPING HANDS OF LONDON

Charity number: 1181363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 09 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 October 2019 04 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 09 August 2020 8 days late Download