Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN'S CHURCH, SHILDON

Charity number: 1181299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Carol Harris Chair 24 June 2020
SHILDON ALIVE
Received: On time
Beverley Alison Walker Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Lynne Hilda Arnold Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Jane Abigail Copland Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Harris Mr Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
PAUL ARNOLD DIP PFS Trustee 01 December 2018
NORTHERN VOICES
Received: On time
Carl Stephen Bennett Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Dorothy Truby Trustee 01 April 2014
SHILDON ALIVE
Received: On time
Adele Todd Trustee 01 April 2011
None on record
ANN SANDERSON Trustee 01 April 2010
None on record
Olga Daisy Bainbridge Trustee 01 April 2010
None on record
Anne Marie Cleasby Trustee 01 April 2010
None on record