Trustees LAMPLUGH VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1182295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Twyford | Chair | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Benn-Cross | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Shaw | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barry Watts | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Joseph Stevens | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN SHEPHERDSON | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen King | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger Troughton | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Reed | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.