THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST. LEONARD, BRIDGNORTH

Charity number: 1181347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Ruth Wilson Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
John Fadelle Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
David Oxtoby Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Howell Trustee 07 April 2019
THE BRIDGNORTH PARISH CHARITY Received: On time
Dr John Lawrence Turnock Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
CHRISTINE MARGARET BLAZE Trustee 17 April 2016
EARDINGTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Rev Clive Ian Munday Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Nicola Jayne Cooper Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Jane Ann Peeler Trustee 22 September 2018 None on record
Jane Alison Hadwell Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Jane Elizabeth Parr Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Sheila Margaret Royle Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
Rev Simon Howard Cawdell Chair 28 June 2010
THE ST MARY'S BRIDGNORTH RESTORATION TRUST Received: On time
ST. LEONARD'S, WEAVER AND BLUECOAT TRUST Received: On time
ALITHEA JANE BATES Received: On time
THE HEREFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE BRIDGNORTH PARISH CHARITY Received: On time
Roger George Taylor Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
ELIZABETH ANN BIRD Trustee 25 November 2015
THE BRIDGNORTH PARISH CHARITY Received: On time
Rachel Michele Ross Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record