Trustees WOODBRIDGE TIDE MILL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1184163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHRISTOPHER CARRINGTON | Chair | 04 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Ryan | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jacob | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Amanda de Margary | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Peeke | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Lady Vicki Jessel | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian McKechnie | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Sutton | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Joseph Gillard | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Edwin Holdcroft | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.