Trustees DASH (DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS HUDDERSFIELD)

Charity number: 1181825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mohannad Al Mohammad Al Abo Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Jihad Hussein Adam Omer Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Peter Evans Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Sophie Ballinger Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
Karen Elizabeth Wood Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Julie Ann Park Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Allison Porter Trustee 31 January 2019
None on record
Andrew Mark Tomlinson Trustee 31 January 2019
None on record