Trustees WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT ATHLETICS CLUB
Charity number: 1182382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mann | Chair | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cripps | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Joslin | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Cox | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Gill | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA JANE WILSON | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Bowyer | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Tracy Thatcher | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Miles | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.