LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MONICA'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 513694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 August 2017 On time Download