Financial history FRIENDS OF CARLTON DIGBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 513751
Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £400 £14.48k £23.83k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £120 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A