Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S AND LARK LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 11 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 11 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 17 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window