Trustees LECKHAMPTON ROVERS FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1182944

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Blaney | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jeffrey Mercer | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nico George Kontou Goymer | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lee | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Austin Packer | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Muncaster | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Hay | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Russell | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Devlin | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jackson | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Damien Peter McLoughlin | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Beaney | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Pitts | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pitchford | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.