THE LETHERHEAD INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1185057
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY MARGARET PORTER Trustee 13 February 2006 None on record
PAUL KENDALL HARRISON Chair 08 August 2011 None on record
JOHN MARTYN HICKEY Trustee 17 March 2008 None on record
MARTIN WILLIAM COLE Trustee 12 June 2017 None on record
GRANT JOHN CLIFFORD Trustee 13 May 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LEATHERHEAD Received: On time