Accounts and annual returns DEEPING ST NICHOLAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1184130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window