LYTHAM ST ANNES PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 513963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.09k £5.56k £8.95k £7.30k £3.31k
Total expenditure £4.28k £4.42k £6.77k £5.90k £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A