Trustees THE INVESTMENT MANAGERS' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1185382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Harvey Yadgaroff Trustee 21 January 2022
BALTIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
AJEX - The Jewish Military Association
Received: On time
THE WESTERN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
AJEX CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Philip Clark Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Erik Per Oscar Berggren Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Tarandeep Singh Panesar Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Roberta Sanminiatelli Trustee 06 January 2021
None on record
Virginia Salter Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Christopher ROBINSON Trustee 12 June 2019
CRANLEIGH AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Melissa Frances Rose Longley Trustee 12 June 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE
Received: On time
ANDREW LEIGHTON CRAIG BELL Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
Celia Patricia da Silva Huber Soares Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record