LOWRY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 514098
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total income £8.98k £4.26k £4.57k £8.99k £5.39k
Total expenditure £2.69k £5.76k £5.93k £7.20k £5.76k