Trustees ARDAL GWEINIDOGAETH BRO CELYNNIN MINISTRY AREA
Charity number: 1185028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Elizabeth Richmond Baldon | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwynn Morris Griffith | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Anne Fysh | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lana Jessica Davidson Flood | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Geoffrey Holliland | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Christine Jones | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek James Fabby | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Myfanwy Clough | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Rev. Susan Blagden MTh | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Frances Thompson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Tobin | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Millen Swallow | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Evelyn Young MSc MBA | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Mostyn Roberts | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
The Rev. Eryl Haf Parry | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Roderick Baldon | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Shakespear | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosalynd Mitchell | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.