Trustees HORNSEA MEN IN SHEDS
Charity number: 1184335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN CUSWORTH | Chair | 05 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Dawn Prest | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Turvill | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Heather McKee | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Amherst | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Blogg | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Roadley | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Marshall | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.