Trustees DEFENCE MEDICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1185308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Perkins Chair 11 December 2019
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Carter Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Craig Haslam Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Christopher Warren Rowley Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Thomas David Francis Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
James Radley Norman Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
lUCY Rhodes Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
PETER CORBETT Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Timothy Peter Clarke Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
Susan Ann Huggins OBE MBA Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record