RAMSEY NEIGHBOURHOODS TRUST

Charity number: 1186733
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua Jenkins Trustee 01 January 2012 None on record
Carol Aston Trustee 18 October 2012 None on record
Stephen Selby Trustee 21 November 2017 None on record
Joe Boni-Rattue Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Christine Mally Chair 14 October 2020 None on record
Carol Cornfield Trustee 15 July 2016
RAMSEY HERITAGE PARTNERSHIP Recently registered
Linda Collumbell Trustee 14 October 2015 None on record
Annie Wells Trustee 01 January 2012
RAMSEY HERITAGE PARTNERSHIP Recently registered
Robert Johnson Trustee 14 October 2018 None on record