Accounts and annual returns RESPEITO LTD

Charity number: 1189055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021